U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03098
  • Case Name: Szobody v. Rocky Patel Premium Cigars et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Issued]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 24, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.