U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-08232--ASB
  • Case Name: Gibson #041023 v. Thornell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of E-Service by AZ AG]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [AZ AG Service Order (2254)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.