U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08038
  • Case Name: Dalley et al v. Federal Express Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 26, 2025: [Vacate]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.