U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00667
  • Case Name: Pulte Home Company LLC et al v. Knight Specialty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • April 23, 2025: [Third Party Complaint ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Third Party Complaint ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 12, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.