U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03368
  • Case Name: McQueen v. University of North Dakota et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.