U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00760
  • Case Name: Harris v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 11, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 02, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 24, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 12, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.