U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00044
  • Case Name: O.W. v. Arizona, State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 08, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.