U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00823
  • Case Name: Eldredge v. American Airlines Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.