U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00111
  • Case Name: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Reid et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Service Unexecuted]
  • March 26, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.