U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00570
  • Case Name: Fidler v. Arizona, State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.