U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00821
  • Case Name: Lopez v. Equifax Information Services LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 11, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • April 09, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.