U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00085
  • Case Name: Fadeyeva v. Bynum Transport Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 03, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.