U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Morgan v. Bose Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 12, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.