U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00819
  • Case Name: Watts v. Woods
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Remark (Public) ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 25, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • March 17, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Doc (NOT Motion/Complaint/Cross/Counter/3rd Party Claim)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 12, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 12, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 12, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.