U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00818
  • Case Name: Chew v. Homesite Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Demand for Jury Trial by Plaintiff]
  • March 17, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.