U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03286
  • Case Name: Young v. Halenar et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.