U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Dunlap #124173 v. NaphCare Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Service Unexecuted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.