U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00230
  • Case Name: Esparza et al v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • April 02, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 20, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • March 20, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • March 12, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.