U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00561
  • Case Name: Elowson v. Alphatec Spine Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • March 18, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 17, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
  • March 14, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.