U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Baird v. Experian Information Solutions Incorporated et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.