U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00255
  • Case Name: Complot et al v. Citibank NA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 07, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 19, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.