U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00086
  • Case Name: Tucson Indoor Football LLC v. FBG Enterprises Opco LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney)]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.