U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01423
  • Case Name: Mishkin v. ICON PLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 24, 2025: [Request]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 21, 2025: [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.