U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00838
  • Case Name: Cope v. Suns Legacy Partners LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • April 15, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • March 27, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
  • March 14, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.