U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00323
  • Case Name: Mathis #309314 v. CoreCivic et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution (Within Firm Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.