U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01733
  • Case Name: Thompson v. Westwind School of Aeronautics Phoenix et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 12, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.