U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00822--MTM
  • Case Name: Lucero #370109 v. NaphCare Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.