U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Delgado et al v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Text Order: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge]
  • April 01, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.