U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00678
  • Case Name: Hughes v. Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address/Email/Firm Name (Attorney)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 26, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.