U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00177
  • Case Name: Shippy v. Banner Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.