U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00152
  • Case Name: Fahr #133059 v. Centurion et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 04, 2025: [Lodged Proposed Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.