U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02774
  • Case Name: Robinson v. Chas Roberts Air Conditioning Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Conference ]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Dismiss Counts/Claims]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Show Cause ]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.