U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00601
  • Case Name: Perri v. Cactus Coffee Two LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 01, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.