U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Reczko v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.