U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-02673
  • Case Name: DeWitte v. Gilbert Unified School District No. 41
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Time Change Only - Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Confidential Doc. Designation Lodging (LRCiv 5.6.(d))]
  • April 07, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.