U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00843
  • Case Name: Carrato et al v. Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 18, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 13, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.