U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03698
  • Case Name: Desert Hills Presbyterian Church Incorporated v. NCWPCS MPL 28 - Year Sites Tower Holdings LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 15, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • April 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 03, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Appear]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 26, 2025: [Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.