U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01909
  • Case Name: Daniele et al v. Sheridan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Stipulation]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 02, 2025: [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Termination/Withdrawal]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.