U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00841
  • Case Name: Pedal Crawler Tours Tucson LLC v. Scottsdale Party Bikes LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 02, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim ]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information]
  • March 13, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2025: [Counterclaim ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.