U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00708
  • Case Name: Legaspi v. Walmart Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Report - Status]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.