U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-03582
  • Case Name: Williams v. Exeter Finance LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Party Only (Not Entire Case)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.