U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02461
  • Case Name: Koons #106486 v. Washburn et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 24, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 02, 2025: [Service Packet Forwarded to USMS (Pris E-Filing)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Service Unexecuted]
  • March 13, 2025: [Service Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.