U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00619
  • Case Name: Yokois v. Thornell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 03, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Compel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.