U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-02751
  • Case Name: Heyward v. Gunther
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Response to Habeas Petition (Fed/2241)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Service Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.