U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00787
  • Case Name: Barr v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • April 10, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Service of Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 14, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.