U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00858
  • Case Name: Hapitana v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.