U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00854
  • Case Name: Hirschuber v. Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
  • April 01, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 17, 2025: [25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Election Form Deadline ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order of Recusal]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 14, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.