U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00118
  • Case Name: System Engineering Services Corporation v. DirectWeb Administrative Services LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Submitted]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.