U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00529
  • Case Name: Goldan et al v. Toll Brothers AZ Limited Partnership
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.