U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-08054
  • Case Name: Driscoll v. JEF Investments LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 22, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 17, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Request by Non-Prisoner Pro Se Party for Electronic Noticing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 21, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 20, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response]
  • March 17, 2025: [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency (Text Only)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice to Self-Represented Litigant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [New Case Opened]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Service Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.